+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2023: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8