+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: Failed
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (10)
April 28, 2016: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
March 3, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1