+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 264
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref CEM)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pm
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Crandell flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-21 cem_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
3-24 cem_strikermemo_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
3-17 cem_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-10 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor