+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- Conference committee recommendation: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: KAVANAGH, BURGES, QUEZADA
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: LEACH, ALLEN J, CARDENAS
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Kavanagh #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Kavanagh #1 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (6)
Kavanagh #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh #1 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 17, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
March 17, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3