+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- House Education Committee: withdrawn.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
January 26, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 26, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor