+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 171
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chad Campbell #2
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Chad Campbell Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Chad Campbell Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2401gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
February 5, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8