+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: HEALTH
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Health - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2013: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 23, 2013: Health: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor