+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 215
- Action: Signed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor