+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:55 amobject
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-26 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2007: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2007: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2007: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1