+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 6, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2022: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 17, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 9
January 24, 2022: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 24, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor