+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 119
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pmobject
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 5:15 pm
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2012: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2012: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor