+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 113 e
- Action: Signed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:46 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Withdrawn
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
4-7 nrt_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
March 10, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 19, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor