+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- ED - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:14PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 23, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 55
March 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 28, 2017: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 2, 2017: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor