+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 58
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:37 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendment
2-22 ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor