+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:21 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to Anderson Sub Fl Am to ED - Schapira
- Amendment: ED
- Amendment: Sub Floor Amend to ED - Anderson
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass amended
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
Schapira Substitute Floor amendment to the Anderson Substitute Floor amendment to the Education (K-12) Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Schapira Substitute Floor amendment to the Anderson Substitute Floor amendment to the Education (K-12) Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-31 k12
Senate Fact Sheet
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2008: Education K-12: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor