+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 211
- Action: Signed
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House adopts conference committee
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- Senate appointed: Crandell, Griffin, Pancrazi
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House appointed: Pierce J, Mccune Davis, Montenegro
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref PS)
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Senate first read
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to PSMRA - Pierce
- Amendment passed: PSMRA
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (20)
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pierce J Floor Amendment; Reference to PUBLIC SAFETY, MILITARY AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Pierce J Floor Amendment; Reference to PUBLIC SAFETY, MILITARY AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref PS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref PS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
June 13, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
April 23, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 24, 2013: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8