+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 7, 2008 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 27, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmit to Senate
On June 27, 2008 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- Conference committee
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Conference committee
On June 23, 2008 in the House:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On June 16, 2008 in the House:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: O'Halleran flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Garcia flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Garcia flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Waring flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Cheuvront flr amend (ref Waring flr amend)
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
O'Halleran Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Cheuvront Floor Amendment; reference to Waring Floor Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Kavanaugh Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
5-21jud_aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
7-9jud_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
4-3 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 27, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 6
June 27, 2008: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
May 19, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
March 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor