+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 254
- Action: Signed
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 4:00 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 14, 2012: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2012: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor