+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Children and Family Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Children and Family Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Children and Family Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
January 25, 2016: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: House Children and Family Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor