+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- CFA - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Allen - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Children and Family Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Children and Family Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Children and Family Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Allen - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Children and Family Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 29, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: House Children and Family Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 21, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
January 21, 2016: Children and Family Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor