+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gray flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Pratt
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 6:21 pmobject
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Gray flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pratt Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pratt Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-21 approp_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Gray flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 3, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2012: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 17, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor