+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: withdrawn.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to COM - Griffin - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 1
January 27, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 27, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor