+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston - passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:05PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 27, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 7
January 31, 2017: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 31, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor