+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 109
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
March 20, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor