+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by JUD - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to JUD - Blackman - passed
- Amended by APPROP - withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 26
February 4, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor