+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 284
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House adopt
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House adopts conference committee
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopt
- Senate adopts conference committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
- Senate appointed: Worsley, Farley, Farnsworth D
- Senate reports to conference committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House appointed: Olson, GabaldÓN, Bowers
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref FIN)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to WM Olson passed
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
April 2, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2015: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor