+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Kern moved that the House reconsider HB 2382 within the next 7 days. Motion passed by s/v 31-28
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor amend to PS - Kern - passed
- PS - passed as amended
- TRANS - withdrawn
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 30
January 30, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2019: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor