+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Gov
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate second read
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HED - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor amend to Ableser Sub Floor amend to Rios #1 Sub Floor Amend to Rios #2 Floor Amend to HED - Anderson
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HED - Burns
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Jennifer Burns Floor amendment, reference to the Higher Education Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Anderson Substitute Floor amendment to the Ableser Substitute Floor Amendment to the Rios #1 Substitute Floor amendment to the Rios #2 Floor amendment to the Higher Education Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Proposed Amendment
Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Education K-12
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2007: Education K-12: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2007: Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor