+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Sdbr
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 27
February 3, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor