+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 8, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 5, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor