+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to HHS - Barto - passed
- HHS - passed as amended
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
April 15, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 5, 2019: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
January 30, 2019: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor