+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
- JUD - withdrawn
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
March 15, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 15, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 28, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 19, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor