+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:05PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 31, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor