+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:27PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 26, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
January 30, 2019: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
January 30, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor