+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Carter - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:18PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 27, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 27, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 31, 2017: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor