+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2023: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 21, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2023: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor