+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 264
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 28, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor