+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- HEALTH
- SUB Floor Amend to HEALTH to Bill - Livingston - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Friese #1 - failed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Friese #2 - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 10, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
February 28, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 28, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
January 31, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 31, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 31, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9