+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 73
- Action: Signed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: TRANS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 1, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
February 28, 2013: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2013: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor