+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2021: House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
January 20, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor