+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
January 25, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2016: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3