+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:30 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendment
7-22 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2009: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
June 10, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 27, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3