+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- MAPS - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 29, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor