+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 305
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref PSMT)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref PSMT) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 2, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2015: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
February 2, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 2, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor