+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-9 nrt-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 17, 2012: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor