+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 140
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
2360fin
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
June 18, 2009: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
January 27, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 27, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2