+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 222
- Action: Signed
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: WLRD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: AW
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Adopted Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Water, Land Use and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-15 wlrd_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Agriculture and Water
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
January 17, 2012: Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1