+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 125
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:05 pmobject
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-27 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 20, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor