+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 117
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HHS
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 27, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2012: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 20, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 7
January 17, 2012: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1