+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Amended by GOV (ref Bill) adopted
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh - passed
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 60
April 13, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 3, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
January 26, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8